Ahia v. Lee

Court: Hawaii Supreme Court
Date filed: 2023-02-08
Citations:
Copy Citations
Click to Find Citing Cases
Combined Opinion
                                                        Electronically Filed
                                                        Supreme Court
                                                        SCEC-XX-XXXXXXX
                                                        08-FEB-2023
                                                        11:26 AM
                                                        Dkt. 87 ODMR

                          SCEC-XX-XXXXXXX

           IN THE SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF HAWAIʻI
________________________________________________________________

  J. NOELANI AHIA, SHAYNE NAMEAAEA HOSHINO, KACI-CHEREE DIZON,
    SHAWN-CHRISTIAN DIZON, CODY NEMET, FAY MCFARLANE, NORRIS
 MCFARLANE, JADE CHIHARA, KEVIN BLOCK, OLIVIA NGUYEN, TRINETTE
 FURTADO, KEISA LIU, CAROL LEE KAMEKONA, EMILIE VINCENT, LAURA
    JOHNSON, HARRY JOHNSON, SARA TEKULA, RENA BLUMBERG, MAYA
   MARQUEZ, JASON MEDINA, STACEY MONIZ, CHRISTY KAHOOHANOHANO,
   REAGAN KAHOOHANOHANO, ZION EBBERSON, RAUL GOODNESS, TERRILL
      JAMES KANE ALII WILLIAMS, LORI SIERRA KNIGHT, GRETCHEN
          LEISENRING, JONATH PADILLA, ALENA ORNELLAS, and
                 SANDRA IMBERI IOAKIMI, Plaintiffs,

                                vs.

 ALICE L. LEE, KATHY L. KAOHU, County Clerk, County of Maui, and
     SCOTT T. NAGO, Chief Elections Office, State of Hawaiʻi,
                           Defendants.
________________________________________________________________

                        ORIGINAL PROCEEDING

            ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
     (By: Recktenwald, C.J., Nakayama, McKenna, and Eddins, JJ.;
                     and Wilson, J., dissenting)

          Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs’ January 30, 2023

motion for reconsideration of the January 20, 2023 Findings of

Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Judgment, and the record in this

matter, this court has not overlooked or misapprehended points
of law or fact.   See Hawaiʻi Rules of Appellate Procedure Rule

40(b).   Accordingly, it is ordered that the motion for

reconsideration is denied.

           DATED: Honolulu, Hawaiʻi, February 8, 2023.

                                     /s/ Mark E. Recktenwald

                                     /s/ Paula A. Nakayama

                                     /s/ Sabrina S. McKenna

                                     /s/ Todd W. Eddins




                                 2